Mantle Mining Corporation Limited
ABN 70 107 180 441
Annual Report 2016
Corporate Directory 3
Directors' Report 4
Corporate Governance Statement 36
Consolidated Statement of Comprehensive Income 47
Consolidated Statement of Financial Position 48
Consolidated Statement of Cash Flows 49
Consolidated Statement of Changes in Equity 50
Notes to the Financial Statements 51
Directors' Declaration 74
Independent Auditor's Report 75
Auditor's Independence Declaration 77
Shareholder Information 78
Directors
Mr Robert Barraket Non-Executive Chairman Dr Richard Valenta Executive Director
Mr Ian King Non-Executive Director Mr Matthew Gill Non-Executive Director
Company Secretaries
Mr Winton Willesee Miss Erlyn Dale
Principal Place of Business and Registered Office
Suite 25
145 Stirling Highway Nedlands WA 6009
Contact Details
Mail: PO Box 3144 Nedlands WA 6009
Website: www.mantlemining.com Email: [email protected] Tel: +61 8 9389 3130
Fax: +61 8 9389 3199
Auditors
RSM Australia Partners 8 St George's Terrace Perth WA 6000
Solicitors to the Company
Steinepreis Paganin
Level 4, The Read Buildings 16 Milligan Street
Perth WA 6000
Share Registry
Security Transfer Registrars Alexandria House
Suite 1
770 Canning Highway Applecross WA 6153
Tel: +61 8 9315 2333
Fax: +61 8 9315 2233
Stock Exchange
Australian Securities Exchange Level 40, Central Park,
152-158 St Georges Terrace Perth WA 6000
ASX Code: MNM
MNMOC
Your Directors present their report for the year ended 30 June 2016.
DIRECTORS
The names and details of the Directors in office at any time during or since the end of the financial year are as follows:
Mr Robert Barraket - Non-Executive Chairman (Appointed 23 June 2016) Dr Richard Valenta - Executive Director (Appointed 26 July 2016)
Mr Ian King - Non-Executive Director (Appointed 23 June 2016)
Mr Matthew Gill - Non-Executive Director (Appointed 22 August 2016)
Mr Martin Blakeman - Non-Executive Chairman (Resigned 23 June 2016) Mr Ian Kraemer - Managing Director (Resigned 22 August 2016)
Mr Stephen de Belle - Non-Executive Director (Resigned 22 July 2016)
All Directors have been in office since the start of the financial period to the date of this report unless otherwise stated.
Mr Robert Barraket - Non-Executive Chairman
Qualifications: LLB
Appointed: 23 June 2016
Mr Barraket is the Chairman of Barraket Stanton Lawyers in Sydney and has more than 50 years' experience advising international and Australian companies including mining companies. Mr Barraket is also Chairman of Pacific Rim explorer, Axiom Mining Limited.
Over the past three years Mr Barraket has held directorships with the following ASX-listed companies:
Company
|
Commenced
|
Ceased
|
Axiom Mining Limited
|
19 February 2016
|
Current
|
Dr Richard Valenta - Executive Director Qualifications: BSc, PhD, PGeo, FAusimm, MAICD Appointed: 26 July 2016
Dr Valenta is a former managing director of Chesser Resources Limited with over 30 years' experience in Australia and internationally, including the successful discovery, advancement and sale of the Kestanelik project in Turkey. Over the past 15 years, Dr Valenta has played a key role in the discovery and advancement toward production of a number of significant gold projects and has directed exploration expenditure in excess of US$100 million, resulting in the discovery and advancement of resources with a total in-ground value of $US$10 billion.
Over the past three years Mr Valenta has held directorships with the following ASX-listed companies:
Company
|
Commenced
|
Ceased
|
Chesser Resources Ltd
|
July 2007
|
February 2015
|
Mr Ian King - Non-Executive Director Qualifications: BCom(Hons), LLB Appointed: 23 June 2016
Mr King is a founding director of Sydney-based boutique corporate advisory business, BBB Capital. He has more than 25 years' experience in investment banking and corporate advisory services across a broad range of sectors including mining and resources.
Over the past three years Mr King has not held other directorships with any other ASX-listed companies: