Microsoft Word - 160503 New MD
ASX Announcement
3 May 2016
AWE's new Managing Director commences
Further to the Company's announcement on 19 March 2016, AWE advises that effective today, David Biggs has assumed the position of Managing Director of AWE Limited.
Accordingly, with effect from the close of business on 2 May 2016, Bruce Clement is no longer Managing Director of the Company.
Attached to this announcement is an Appendix 3X (Initial Directors Interest Notice) for David Biggs and an Appendix 3Z (Final Directors Interest Notice) for Bruce Clement.
For information please see our website www.awexplore.com or contact:
Managing Director Investor Relations
David Biggs Matthew Sullivan
AWE Limited AWE Limited
02 8912 8000 02 8912 8022
[email protected]
About AWE Limited
AWE Limited is an independent, Australian energy company focused on upstream oil and gas opportunities. Established in 1997 and listed on the Australian Securities Exchange (ASX: AWE), the company is based in Sydney with project offices in Perth and New Zealand. AWE has a substantial portfolio of production, development and exploration assets in Australia, New Zealand, and Indonesia.
Appendix 3X Initial Director's Interest Notice
Appendix 3X
Initial Director's Interest Notice
Rule 3.19A.1
Information or documents not available now must be given to ASX as soon as available. Information and documents given to ASX become ASX's property and may be made public.
Introduced 30/9/2001.
Name of entity AWE Limited ABN 70 077 897 440
We (the entity) give ASX the following information under listing rule 3.19A.1 and as agent for the director for the purposes of section 205G of the Corporations Act.
Name of Director
|
David Arthur John Biggs
|
Date of appointment
|
3 May 2016
|
Part 1 - Director's relevant interests in securities of which the director is the registered holder
In the case of a trust, this includes interests in the trust made available by the responsible entity of the trust
Note: In the case of a company, interests which come within paragraph (i) of the definition of "notifiable interest of a director" should be disclosed in this part.
Number & class of securities
Nil
+ See chapter 19 for defined terms.
11/3/2002 Appendix 3X Page 1
Appendix 3X
Initial Director's Interest Notice
Part 2 - Director's relevant interests in securities of which the director is not the registered holder
In the case of a trust, this includes interests in the trust made available by the responsible entity of the trust
Name of holder & nature of interest
Note: Provide details of the circumstances giving rise to the relevant interest.
Nil
Number & class of Securities
Part 3 - Director's interests in contracts
Note: In the case of a company, interests which come within paragraph (ii) of the definition of "notifiable interest of a director" should be disclosed in this part.
Detail of contract
|
Not Applicable
|
Nature of interest
|
Name of registered holder (if issued securities)
|
No. and class of securities to which interest relates
|
+ See chapter 19 for defined terms.
Appendix 3X Page 2 11/3/2002
Appendix 3Z Final Director's Interest Notice
Appendix 3Z
Final Director's Interest Notice
Rule 3.19A.3
Information or documents not available now must be given to ASX as soon as available. Information and documents given to ASX become ASX's property and may be made public.
Introduced 30/9/2001.
Name of entity AWE Limited
ABN 70 077 897 440
We (the entity) give ASX the following information under listing rule 3.19A.3 and as agent for the director for the purposes of section 205G of the Corporations Act.
Name of director
|
Bruce Frederick William Clement
|
Date of last notice
|
17 September 2015
|
Date that director ceased to be director
|
2 May 2016
|
Part 1 - Director's relevant interests in securities of which the director is the registered holder
In the case of a trust, this includes interests in the trust made available by the responsible entity of the trust
Note: In the case of a company, interests which come within paragraph (i) of the definition of "notifiable interest of a director" should be disclosed in this part.
Number & class of securities Registered Holder
|
Nature of Interest
|
No. of Securities
|
Ordinary Shares
Bruce F W Clement
|
Registered Holder
|
773,848
|
Cash Share Rights
|
Bruce F W Clement
|
Registered Holder
|
427,474 (1)
|
Bruce F W Clement
|
Registered Holder
|
365,552 (2)
|
Total Cash Share Rights
|
793,026
|
-
Approved at the 2013 AGM and to be tested for vesting 30 June 2016
-
Approved at the 2014 AGM to be tested for vesting 30 June 2017, pro-rated to the date on which Mr Clement's employment comes to an end.
+ See chapter 19 for defined terms.
11/3/2002 Appendix 3Z Page 1